US HR124 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-10)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Pursuant to section 6 of H. Res. 330, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 367; H.R. 370; H.R. 396; H.R. 397, as amended; H.R. 408; H.R. 490; H.R. 965, as amended; H.R. 1251, as amended; H.R. 1395; H.R. 1491; H.R. 1528; H.R. 1532; H.R. 1565; H.R. 1602; and H.R. 2523, as amended; and the following resolution was agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 124, as amended. (consideration: CR H1979-1994; text: CR H1992-1993)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Pursuant to section 6 of H. Res. 330, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 367; H.R. 370; H.R. 396; H.R. 397, as amended; H.R. 408; H.R. 490; H.R. 965, as amended; H.R. 1251, as amended; H.R. 1395; H.R. 1491; H.R. 1528; H.R. 1532; H.R. 1565; H.R. 1602; and H.R. 2523, as amended; and the following resolution was agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 124, as amended. (consideration: CR H1979-1994; text: CR H1992-1993)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting the people of Belarus and their democratic aspirations and condemning the election rigging and subsequent violent crackdowns on peaceful protesters by the illegitimate Lukashenka regime.
Title
Supporting the people of Belarus and their democratic aspirations and condemning the election rigging and subsequent violent crackdowns on peaceful protesters by the illegitimate Lukashenka regime.
Sponsors
Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] |
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] |
Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] |
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Peter Meijer [R-MI] | Rep. Young Kim [R-CA] |
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] |
Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] |
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] |
Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Pursuant to section 6 of H. Res. 330, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 367; H.R. 370; H.R. 396; H.R. 397, as amended; H.R. 408; H.R. 490; H.R. 965, as amended; H.R. 1251, as amended; H.R. 1395; H.R. 1491; H.R. 1528; H.R. 1532; H.R. 1565; H.R. 1602; and H.R. 2523, as amended; and the following resolution was agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 124, as amended. (consideration: CR H1979-1994; text: CR H1992-1993) |
2021-04-20 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 330, proceedings on H. Res. 124 are considered vacated. |
2021-04-19 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-04-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 124. |
2021-04-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1934-1937; text: CR H1934-1936) |
2021-04-19 | House | Mr. Meeks moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Energy, the Environment and Cyber. |
2021-02-25 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-02-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-02-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2021-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR330 (Related) 2021-04-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.