US HR1337 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses condolences to the families of those who lost their lives or property as the result of flooding beginning on May 2, 2010, in Tennessee, Kentucky, and Mississippi.Expresses: (1) appreciation to the people of Tennessee and the surrounding states who continue to work to protect people from the floodwaters and aid in recovery efforts; and (2) support as the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) continues to respond to needs of the affected communities.Honors the emergency responders across Tennessee for their bravery and sacrifice.
Title
Expressing the sympathy and condolences of the House of Representatives to those people affected by the flooding in Tennessee, Kentucky, and Mississippi in May, 2010.
Sponsors
Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] | Rep. Lincoln Davis [D-TN] |
Rep. John Duncan [R-TN] | Rep. Bart Gordon [D-TN] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. John Tanner [D-TN] |
Rep. Zach Wamp [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-13 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-05-13 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 402 - 0 (Roll no. 272). (text: CR 5/12/2010 H3333) | |
2010-05-13 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3458-3459) | |
2010-05-12 | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. | |
2010-05-12 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1337. | |
2010-05-12 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3333-3336) | |
2010-05-12 | Mr. Cohen moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. | |
2010-05-12 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. | |
2010-05-06 | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Disaster relief and insurance
Floods and storm protection
Kentucky
Mississippi
Tennessee