US HR149 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-10)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Condemning the illegal abduction of children from Ukraine to the Russian Federation.
Title
Condemning the illegal abduction and forcible transfer of children from Ukraine to the Russian Federation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Agree, as Amended RC# 88 (Y: 390 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2024-03-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-03-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 390 - 9 (Roll no. 88). (text: CR H1201-1202) |
2024-03-19 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1221-1222) |
2024-03-19 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2024-03-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 149. |
2024-03-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1201-1203) |
2024-03-19 | House | Mrs. Wagner moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2023-11-07 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by the Yeas and Nays: 44 - 0. |
2023-11-07 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2023-02-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR158 (Same As) 2023-06-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 99.