US HR150 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 62-20)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
Pending: House Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
Pending: House Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of February 20 to February 27, 2021, as "National FFA Week", recognizing the important role of the National FFA (FFA) Organization in developing the next generation of leaders who will change the world, and celebrating 50 years of National FFA Alumni and Supporters.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of February 20 to February 27, 2021, as "National FFA Week", recognizing the important role of the National FFA (FFA) Organization in developing the next generation of leaders who will change the world, and celebrating 50 years of National FFA Alumni and Supporters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research. |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
2021-02-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR83 (Related) 2021-03-01 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S922; text: CR S960)
SR524 (Related) 2022-02-17 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S800; text: CR S794)
SR524 (Related) 2022-02-17 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S800; text: CR S794)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/150/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres150/BILLS-117hres150ih.pdf |