US HR259 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses the sense of the House of Representatives that (1) the United States should support the safe return of displaced indigenous people of the Nineveh Plain and Sinjar to their ancestral homeland; and (2) the Iraqi Security Forces and the Kurdish Peshmerga should work to more fully integrate all communities, including religious minority communities, to counter current and future terrorist threats.
Title
Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives to support the repatriation of religious and ethnic minorities in Iraq to their ancestral homelands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-06-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-03-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Foreign aid and international relief
International affairs
Iraq
Middle East
Racial and ethnic relations
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Religion
International affairs
Iraq
Middle East
Racial and ethnic relations
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Religion
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/259/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres259/BILLS-116hres259ih.pdf |