US HR309 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution recognizes the significance of the 44th anniversary of the Fall of Saigon on April 30, 1975. The resolution honors the contributions of Vietnamese Americans and honors the service of members of the U.S. Armed Forces and the South Vietnamese forces who fought in Vietnam, including those who gave their lives.
Title
Recognizing the 44th anniversary of the Fall of Saigon on April 30, 1975.
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] | Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA] |
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA] |
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR943 (Related) 2020-04-28 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Asia
Citizenship and naturalization
Commemorative events and holidays
Conflicts and wars
Congressional tributes
Human rights
International affairs
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Vietnam
Citizenship and naturalization
Commemorative events and holidays
Conflicts and wars
Congressional tributes
Human rights
International affairs
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Vietnam
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/309/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres309/BILLS-116hres309ih.pdf |