US HR577 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution provides for consideration of H.B. 2203 (Homeland Security Improvement Act), H.B. 3525 (U.S. Border Patrol Medical Screening Standards Act), and H.Res. 576 (demanding certain action to be taken with respect to the whistle-blower complaint received by the Office of the Inspector General of the Intelligence Community on August 12, 2019). It shall be in order for the Speaker of the House to suspend the rules at any time on the legislative day of September 26, 2019. Certain proceedings may take place on any legislative day from September 30, 2019, through October 14, 2019.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2203) to increase transparency, accountability, and community engagement within the Department of Homeland Security, provide independent oversight of border security activities, improve training for agents and officers of U.S. Customs and Border Protection and U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3525) to amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to direct the Commissioner of U.S. Customs and Border Protection to establish uniform processes for medical screening of individuals interdicted between ports of entry, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the resolution (H. Res. 576) expressing the sense of the House of Representatives with respect to the whistleblower complaint of August 12, 2019, made to the Inspector General of the Intelligence Community; and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-25 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 543 (Y: 228 N: 191 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - On ordering the previous question on the amendment (A001) H.Amdt.623 RC# 542 (Y: 227 N: 191 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - On ordering the previous question on the amendment (A001) H.Amdt.623 RC# 542 (Y: 227 N: 191 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-09-25 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 228 - 191 (Roll no. 543). |
2019-09-25 | House | H.Amdt.623 On agreeing to the Scanlon amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2019-09-25 | House | H.Amdt.623 On ordering the previous question on the amendment (A001) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 227 - 191 (Roll no. 542). (consideration: CR H7919-7920) |
2019-09-25 | House | H.Amdt.623 Amendment (A001) offered by Ms. Scanlon. (consideration: CR H7919-7920; text: CR H7919) |
2019-09-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 577. |
2019-09-25 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H7913-7920) |
2019-09-24 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 43. |
2019-09-24 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2203, H.R. 3525, and H.Res. 576 under closed rules. Rule also provides that it shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of September 26, 2019, for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules; and provides for proceedings during the period from September 30, 2019, through October 14, 2019 |
2019-09-24 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 116-217, by Ms. Scanlon. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2203 (Related) 2019-09-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HR577 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB3525 (Related) 2019-10-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR576 (Related) 2019-09-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR577 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB3525 (Related) 2019-10-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR576 (Related) 2019-09-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.