US HR693 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-17 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-17 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3326) to increase accountability, combat corruption, and strengthen management effectiveness at the World Bank, and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2954) to amend the Home Mortgage Disclosure Act of 1975 to specify which depository institutions are subject to the maintenance of records and disclosure requirements of such Act, and for other purposes. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3326) to increase accountability, combat corruption, and strengthen management effectiveness at the World Bank, and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2954) to amend the Home Mortgage Disclosure Act of 1975 to specify which depository institutions are subject to the maintenance of records and disclosure requirements of such Act.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3326) to increase accountability, combat corruption, and strengthen management effectiveness at the World Bank, and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2954) to amend the Home Mortgage Disclosure Act of 1975 to specify which depository institutions are subject to the maintenance of records and disclosure requirements of such Act, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-17 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 20 (Y: 230 N: 187 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 21 (Y: 228 N: 188 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 21 (Y: 228 N: 188 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-01-17 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 228 - 188 (Roll no. 21). (text: CR H423) |
2018-01-17 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 230 - 187 (Roll no. 20). (consideration: CR H429) |
2018-01-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 693. |
2018-01-17 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H423-429) |
2018-01-16 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 118. |
2018-01-16 | House | The rule provides for one hour of general debate on both measures. Only those amendments printed in Part A of the report shall be considered for H.R. 3326. The amendment printed in Part B of the report, relating to H.R. 2954, shall be considered as adopted. The rule allows for one motion to recommit with or without instructions for both measures. |
2018-01-16 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 115-518, by Mr. Buck. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2954 (Related) 2018-01-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HR693 (Similar To) 2018-01-17 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB3326 (Related) 2018-01-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HR693 (Similar To) 2018-01-17 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB3326 (Related) 2018-01-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.