US HR792 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on October 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of October 17, 2023, as "National Vitiligo Awareness Day".
Title
Expressing support for the designation of October 17, 2023, as "National Vitiligo Awareness Day".
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. Marilyn Strickland [D-WA] |
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] | Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] | Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA] |
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Troy Carter [D-LA] | Rep. Jasmine Crockett [D-TX] |
Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Donald Davis [D-NC] |
Rep. Sheila Cherfilus-McCormick [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-10-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-10-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-resolution/792/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hres792/BILLS-118hres792ih.pdf |