US HR980 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 5585) to impose criminal and immigration penalties for intentionally fleeing a pursuing Federal officer while operating a motor vehicle; providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 6678) to amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to provide that aliens who have been convicted of or who have committed Social Security fraud are inadmissible and deportable; providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 6679) to amend the Immigration and Nationality Act with respect to aliens who carried out, participated in, planned, financed, supported, or otherwise facilitated the attacks against Israel; and providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 6976) to amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to provide that aliens who have been convicted of or who have committed an offense for driving while intoxicated or impaired are inadmissible and deportable.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 5585) to impose criminal and immigration penalties for intentionally fleeing a pursuing Federal officer while operating a motor vehicle; providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 6678) to amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to provide that aliens who have been convicted of or who have committed Social Security fraud are inadmissible and deportable; providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 6679) to amend the Immigration and Nationality Act with respect to aliens who carried out, participated in, planned, financed, supported, or otherwise facilitated the attacks against Israel; and providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 6976) to amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to provide that aliens who have been convicted of or who have committed an offense for driving while intoxicated or impaired are inadmissible and deportable.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution RC# 23 (Y: 216 N: 210 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question RC# 22 (Y: 216 N: 210 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question RC# 22 (Y: 216 N: 210 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-01-30 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 216 - 210 (Roll no. 23). (text: CR H281) |
2024-01-30 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 216 - 210 (Roll no. 22). |
2024-01-30 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H288-289) |
2024-01-30 | House | At the conclusion of debate on H. Res. 980, the Chair put the question on ordering the previous question on the resolution and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. McGovern demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2024-01-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 980. |
2024-01-30 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H281-288) |
2024-01-29 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 59. |
2024-01-29 | House | The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 5585, H.R. 6678, H.R. 6679, and H.R. 6976 under a structured rule. Rule provides for one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit on each measure. |
2024-01-29 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 118-362, by Mr. Burgess. |
2024-01-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5585 (Related) 2024-01-31 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB6678 (Related) 2024-02-05 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB6679 (Related) 2024-02-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB6976 (Related) 2024-03-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB6678 (Related) 2024-02-05 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB6679 (Related) 2024-02-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB6976 (Related) 2024-03-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.