US SB1237 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
DD-214 Modernization Act directs the Department of Defense to modify the Certificate of Release or Discharge from Active Duty (DD Form 214) to include a block in which a member of the Armed Forces may provide an email address by which the member may be contacted after discharge or release from active duty.
Title
DD–214 Modernization Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HB563 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Government information and archives
Military personnel and dependents
Personnel records
Government information and archives
Military personnel and dependents
Personnel records
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/1237/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s1237/BILLS-116s1237is.pdf |