US SB129 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Saint Francis Dam Disaster National Monument and authorizes the Department of Agriculture to establish the Saint Francis Dam Disaster National Memorial to honor the victims of the dam disaster of March 12, 1928. The monument comprises approximately 353 acres of National Forest System land in Los Angeles County, California. The memorial must be established at the dam site and be managed by the Forest Service.
Title
Saint Francis Dam Disaster National Memorial Act
Sponsors
Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-15 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9. (TXT | PDF)
HB1015 (Same As) 2019-02-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB1015 (Same As) 2019-02-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
California
Congressional oversight
Dams and canals
Floods and storm protection
Forests, forestry, trees
Historical and cultural resources
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Water resources development
Congressional oversight
Dams and canals
Floods and storm protection
Forests, forestry, trees
Historical and cultural resources
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Water resources development
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/129/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s129/BILLS-116s129is.pdf |