US SB1325 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Small Business Tax Credits Improvement Act - Amends the Internal Revenue Code, with respect to the tax credit for the health insurance expenses of small employers, to: (1) expand eligibility for the credit to employers having up to 50 (currently, 25) full-time equivalent employees whose annual wages do not exceed $75,000 (currently, $50,000); (2) raise the employee threshold for triggering the phaseout of such credit from 10 to 20 full-time employees; (3) eliminate the requirement that employers contribute the same percentage of cost of each employee's health insurance and the cap limiting eligible employer contributions to average premiums paid to a state health care exchange; and (4) make such credit available to employee-owners and their dependents.
Title
Small Business Tax Credits Improvement Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Begich [D-AK] | Sen. Mary Landrieu [D-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4244 (Related) 2014-03-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4128 (Related) 2014-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4132 (Related) 2014-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4133 (Related) 2014-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB2069 (Related) 2014-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4128 (Related) 2014-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4132 (Related) 2014-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4133 (Related) 2014-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB2069 (Related) 2014-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Employee benefits and pensions
Health care costs and insurance
Income tax credits
Small business
Taxation
Wages and earnings
Health care costs and insurance
Income tax credits
Small business
Taxation
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/1325/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s1325/BILLS-113s1325is.pdf |