US SB1356 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Applies requirements, limitations, and protections regarding political advertising in traditional media to internet or digital political advertising. The bill sets forth special rules for disclosure statements for certain internet or digital ads. Each television or radio station, provider of cable or satellite television, or online platform must ensure that the political advertising it hosts is not directly or indirectly purchased by a foreign national. Online platforms must publish a record of requests to purchase political advertising.
Title
Honest Ads Act
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HB1612 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB2952 (Same As) 2019-05-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2592 (Same As) 2019-05-08 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1612 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB2952 (Same As) 2019-05-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2592 (Same As) 2019-05-08 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Business records
Congressional oversight
Digital media
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Federal Election Commission (FEC)
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Internet and video services
News media and reporting
Political advertising
Subversive activities
Television and film
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Business records
Congressional oversight
Digital media
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Federal Election Commission (FEC)
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Internet and video services
News media and reporting
Political advertising
Subversive activities
Television and film
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/1356/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s1356/BILLS-116s1356is.pdf |