US SB1402 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 117-337.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 117-337.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Native American Languages Act to ensure the survival and continuing vitality of Native American languages, and for other purposes.
Title
Durbin Feeling Native American Languages Act of 2022
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] |
Roll Calls
2022-12-22 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 337 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-05 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-337. |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-12-28 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-12-22 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-12-22 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 337 - 79 (Roll no. 545). (text: 12/21/2022 CR H9956-9957) |
2022-12-22 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10036-10037) |
2022-12-21 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-12-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1402. |
2022-12-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9956-9958) |
2022-12-21 | House | Mrs. Peltola moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-12-21 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-12-21 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-12-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7289) |
2022-12-19 | Senate | S.Amdt.6544 Amendment SA 6544 proposed by Senator Schatz. (consideration: CR S7289; text: CR S7289) In the nature of a substitute. |
2022-12-19 | Senate | S.Amdt.6544 Amendment SA 6544 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7289) |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 175. |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Schatz without amendment. With written report No. 117-45. |
2021-08-04 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |