US SB1582 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the White Sands National Park in New Mexico as a unit of the National Park System in order to protect, preserve, and restore the park's resources and recreational values and to enhance visitor experiences. The bill abolishes the White Sands National Monument and incorporates the lands and interests that comprise the monument in and as a part of the park. The Department of the Interior shall not nominate the park for inclusion on the World Heritage List of the United Nations Educational, Scientific and Cultural Organization (UNESCO) unless each county in which the park is located concurs in the nomination. Before submitting such a nomination, Interior must notify the Department of the Army of its intention to nominate the park for inclusion on the list.
Title
A bill to establish the White Sands National Park in the State of New Mexico as a unit of the National Park System, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HR476 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB871 (Related) 2019-03-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HR476 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB871 (Related) 2019-03-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Subjects
Historic sites and heritage areas
Military facilities and property
Monuments and memorials
New Mexico
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Military facilities and property
Monuments and memorials
New Mexico
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/1582/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s1582/BILLS-116s1582is.pdf |