US SB1696 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates the origination fee on federal student loans. Origination fees are the fees lenders charge for processing new loan applications.
Title
Student Loan Tax Elimination Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] |
Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1899 (Related) 2019-03-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB3674 (Related) 2019-07-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB2065 (Related) 2019-04-03 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB1002 (Related) 2019-04-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB3674 (Related) 2019-07-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB2065 (Related) 2019-04-03 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB1002 (Related) 2019-04-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Education
Government lending and loan guarantees
Higher education
Student aid and college costs
User charges and fees
Government lending and loan guarantees
Higher education
Student aid and college costs
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/1696/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s1696/BILLS-116s1696is.pdf |