US SB1739 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-15 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 116-205.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-15 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 116-205.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Department of Energy National Lab Jobs ACCESS Program to provide grants for technical, skills-based preapprenticeship and apprenticeship programs that provide employer-driven or recognized postsecondary credentials during the five-year grant period.
Title
Department of Energy National Labs Jobs ACCESS Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | Senate | By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 116-205. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 352. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. Without written report. |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HB3135 (Same As) 2019-06-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HR476 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HB3135 (Same As) 2019-06-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HR476 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Department of Energy
Education programs funding
Employment and training programs
Energy research
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Higher education
Intergovernmental relations
Licensing and registrations
Nuclear weapons
Public-private cooperation
Science and engineering education
Science, technology, communications
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Vocational and technical education
Department of Energy
Education programs funding
Employment and training programs
Energy research
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Higher education
Intergovernmental relations
Licensing and registrations
Nuclear weapons
Public-private cooperation
Science and engineering education
Science, technology, communications
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Vocational and technical education