US SB1753 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on August 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SAFE Transitional License Act This bill amends the S.A.F.E. Mortgage Licensing Act of 2008 to temporarily allow loan originators that meet specified requirements to continue to originate loans after moving: (1) from one state to another, or (2) from a depository institution to a non-depository institution.
Title
SAFE Transitional License Act
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Joe Donnelly [D-IN] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] |
Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] |
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB10 (Related) 2017-07-13 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-108.
HB2948 (Related) 2018-02-13 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 414.
HB3280 (Related) 2017-07-26 - Committee on Appropriations Senate Subcommittee on Financial Services and General Government. Hearings held on the subject prior to measure being received from the House. Hearings printed: S. Hrg. 115-191.
HB3354 (Related) 2017-09-27 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 230.
SB2155 (Related) 2018-05-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-174.
HB3978 (Related) 2018-02-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HR905 (Similar To) 2018-05-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2948 (Related) 2018-02-13 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 414.
HB3280 (Related) 2017-07-26 - Committee on Appropriations Senate Subcommittee on Financial Services and General Government. Hearings held on the subject prior to measure being received from the House. Hearings printed: S. Hrg. 115-191.
HB3354 (Related) 2017-09-27 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 230.
SB2155 (Related) 2018-05-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-174.
HB3978 (Related) 2018-02-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HR905 (Similar To) 2018-05-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Government liability
Housing and community development
Housing finance and home ownership
Licensing and registrations
State and local government operations
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Government liability
Housing and community development
Housing finance and home ownership
Licensing and registrations
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/1753/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s1753/BILLS-115s1753is.pdf |