US SB2019 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-31 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 517.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-31 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 517.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SECURE Water Amendments Act of 2014 - Amends the Omnibus Public Land Management Act of 2009 to: (1) include "planning for or addressing the impact of drought" among the activities for which the Secretary may make grants and enter cooperative agreements for water management improvement, (2) include Hawaii among the states in which eligible grant and agreement applicants may be located, (3) authorize appropriations for such grants and agreements, and (4) authorize appropriations for national water availability and use assessment program grants for FY2014-FY2018.
Title
SECURE Water Amendments Act of 2014
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Mark Udall [D-CO] |
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 517. |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Landrieu with amendments. With written report No. 113-230. |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-284. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4258 (Related) 2014-03-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power.
Subjects
Government studies and investigations
Hawaii
Natural disasters
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
Hawaii
Natural disasters
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water use and supply