US SB205 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-01-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S312-313)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-01-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S312-313)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Southwest Border Violence Reduction Act of 2009 - Directs the Attorney General to: (1) to expand resources for the Project Gunrunner initiative of the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives (ATF) to identify, investigate, and prosecute firearms trafficking across the U.S.- Mexico border; and (2) provide ATF agents, equipment, and training to assist Mexican law enforcement officers in combating firearms trafficking and other criminal enterprises.
Title
Southwest Border Violence Reduction Act of 2009
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Bingaman [D-NM] | Sen. Christopher Dodd [D-CT] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Kay Hutchison [R-TX] | Sen. Jon Kyl [R-AZ] | Sen. Mel Martinez [R-FL] | Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] |
Sen. Mark Udall [D-CO] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-01-12 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S312-313) | |
2009-01-12 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S312) |
Same As/Similar To
HB495 (Same As) 2009-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB1437 (Related) 2009-08-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB1448 (Related) 2009-04-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, Refugees, Border Security, and International Law.
HB1867 (Related) 2009-04-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border, Maritime, and Global Counterterrorism.
HB1437 (Related) 2009-08-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB1448 (Related) 2009-04-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, Refugees, Border Security, and International Law.
HB1867 (Related) 2009-04-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border, Maritime, and Global Counterterrorism.
Subjects
Border security and unlawful immigration
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Firearms and explosives
International organizations and cooperation
Latin America
Law enforcement officers
Mexico
Organized crime
Smuggling and trafficking
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/senate-bill/205/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/s205/BILLS-111s205is.pdf |