US SB2109 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes permanent and otherwise revises the Department of Defense's Proof of Concept Commercialization Pilot Program (which accelerates commercialization of basic research innovations). The program must focus on priority defense technology areas that attract public funding and private-sector investment.
Title
National Defense Accelerator Network Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HB3177 (Related) 2019-06-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Intelligence and Emerging Threats and Capabilities.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HB3177 (Related) 2019-06-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Intelligence and Emerging Threats and Capabilities.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Public-private cooperation
Technology transfer and commercialization
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Public-private cooperation
Technology transfer and commercialization
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/2109/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s2109/BILLS-116s2109is.pdf |