US SB2154 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on July 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Defense to implement a program to prepare Junior Reserve Officers' Training Corps students for careers in computer science and cybersecurity. The program may include such elements as internships and cooperative research opportunities, funding for training of instructors, activities to improve the quality of training in these fields, and informal education.
Title
JROTC Cyber Training Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HB3266 (Related) 2019-06-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HB6661 (Related) 2020-05-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HB3266 (Related) 2019-06-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HB6661 (Related) 2020-05-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Defense spending
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Employment and training programs
Military education and training
Performance measurement
Science and engineering education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Defense spending
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Employment and training programs
Military education and training
Performance measurement
Science and engineering education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/2154/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s2154/BILLS-116s2154is.pdf |