US SB2226 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on July 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that congressional redistricting be conducted in accordance with a plan developed by (1) a state-established independent commission; or (2) if such a commission fails to enact a plan, a three-judge panel from a U.S. District Court.
Title
Redistricting Reform Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HB3572 (Same As) 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB4000 (Related) 2019-08-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3572 (Same As) 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB4000 (Related) 2019-08-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Census and government statistics
Civil actions and liability
Congressional districts and representation
Congressional oversight
Election Assistance Commission
Evidence and witnesses
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal district courts
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Judicial review and appeals
Performance measurement
Political parties and affiliation
Public contracts and procurement
Public participation and lobbying
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Voting rights
Civil actions and liability
Congressional districts and representation
Congressional oversight
Election Assistance Commission
Evidence and witnesses
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal district courts
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Judicial review and appeals
Performance measurement
Political parties and affiliation
Public contracts and procurement
Public participation and lobbying
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Voting rights
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/2226/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s2226/BILLS-116s2226is.pdf |