US SB2280 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on July 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to protect our Social Security system and improve benefits for current and future generations.
Title
Social Security 2100 Act
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4583 (Same As) 2023-07-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB82 (Related) 2023-01-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3926 (Related) 2023-06-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB597 (Related) 2023-03-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3974 (Related) 2024-03-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8044 (Related) 2024-04-17 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB82 (Related) 2023-01-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3926 (Related) 2023-06-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB597 (Related) 2023-03-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3974 (Related) 2024-03-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8044 (Related) 2024-04-17 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-bill/2280/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/s2280/BILLS-118s2280is.pdf |