US SB2284 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BuyAmerican.gov Act of 2018
Title
BuyAmerican.gov Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4812 (Related) 2018-01-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
SB2196 (Related) 2017-12-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB6907 (Same As) 2018-09-26 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB2196 (Related) 2017-12-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB6907 (Same As) 2018-09-26 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/2284/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s2284/BILLS-115s2284is.pdf |