US SB2591 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Fish and Wildlife Service to establish the Chesapeake Watershed Investments for Landscape Defense program. Among other duties, the program must establish and carry out a grant and technical assistance program to restore and protect habitat for fish and wildlife in the Chesapeake Bay watershed.
Title
Chesapeake Watershed Investments for Landscape Defense Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] |
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] |
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4967 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
SB3051 (Related) 2020-10-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-188. (TXT | PDF)
HB925 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
HR1161 (Similar To) 2020-09-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3051 (Related) 2020-10-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-188. (TXT | PDF)
HB925 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
HR1161 (Similar To) 2020-09-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Aquatic ecology
Chesapeake Bay
Delaware
District of Columbia
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Land use and conservation
Maryland
New York State
Pennsylvania
Virginia
Water quality
Water use and supply
Watersheds
West Virginia
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Chesapeake Bay
Delaware
District of Columbia
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Land use and conservation
Maryland
New York State
Pennsylvania
Virginia
Water quality
Water use and supply
Watersheds
West Virginia
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/2591/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s2591/BILLS-116s2591is.pdf |