US SB267 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 8 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 8 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
General of the Army Omar Bradley Property Transfer Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) Authorizes the Omar Bradley Foundation, Pennsylvania, to transfer, without consideration, to the child of General of the Army Omar Nelson Bradley and his first wife, Mary Elizabeth Quayle Bradley, such items of the Omar Bradley estate under the control of the Foundation as the Secretary of the Army determines to be without historic value to the Army, provided a claim for such a transfer is submitted within 180 days after enactment of this Act.
Title
General of the Army Omar Bradley Property Transfer Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness. |
2015-09-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2015-09-08 | House | Received in the House. |
2015-08-05 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6325) |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Armed Services discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6325) |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1794 (Same As) 2015-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
HB4909 (Related) 2016-05-26 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 502.
HB4909 (Related) 2016-05-26 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 502.