US SB3210 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-13 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-13 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans' Small Business Opportunity Act of 2012 - Treats the surviving spouse of a service-disabled veteran who acquires the ownership interest in a small business of the deceased veteran as such veteran, for purposes of eligibility for Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) service-disabled small business contracting goals and preferences, for a period of: (1) 10 years after the veteran's death, if such veteran was either 100% disabled or died from a service-connected disability; or (2) 3 years after such death, if the veteran was less than 100% disabled and did not die from a service-connected disability.
Title
Veterans' Small Business Opportunity Act of 2012
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Brown [R-MA] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] | Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-13 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. |
2012-05-21 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3555 (Related) 2012-09-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB6563 (Related) 2012-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB6563 (Related) 2012-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Disability and paralysis
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Disability and paralysis
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-bill/3210/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/s3210/BILLS-112s3210is.pdf |