US SB3250 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - Became Public Law No: 118-37.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - Became Public Law No: 118-37.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide remote access to court proceedings for victims of the 1988 Bombing of Pan Am Flight 103 over Lockerbie, Scotland.
Title
A bill to provide remote access to court proceedings for victims of the 1988 Bombing of Pan Am Flight 103 over Lockerbie, Scotland.
Sponsors
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-18 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass RC# 14 (Y: 413 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 118-37. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2024-01-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-01-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 7 (Roll no. 14). (text: 1/16/2024 CR H145) |
2024-01-18 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H225) |
2024-01-16 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2024-01-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3250. |
2024-01-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H145-146) |
2024-01-16 | House | Mr. Van Drew moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2023-12-11 | House | Held at the desk. |
2023-12-11 | House | Received in the House. |
2023-12-07 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2023-12-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5803) |
2023-12-06 | Senate | S.Amdt.1372 Amendment SA 1372 proposed by Senator Schatz for Senator Cornyn. (consideration: CR S5803) To improve the bill. |
2023-12-06 | Senate | S.Amdt.1372 Amendment SA 1372 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2023-12-06 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5803) |
2023-12-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2023-11-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6714 (Related) 2023-12-11 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.