US SB3370 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to reauthorize the program on prenatal and postnatal health of the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention.
Title
Promoting Maternal and Child Health Through Substance Use Prevention Act
Sponsors
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-30 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2433 (Related) 2023-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3106 (Related) 2023-10-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3303 (Related) 2023-11-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3106 (Related) 2023-10-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3303 (Related) 2023-11-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-bill/3370/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/s3370/BILLS-118s3370is.pdf |