US SB381 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-15 - By Senator Cantwell from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 117-76.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-15 - By Senator Cantwell from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 117-76.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to establish the National Ocean Mapping, Exploration, and Characterization Council, and for other purposes.
Title
National Ocean Exploration Act
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | Senate | By Senator Cantwell from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 117-76. |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 195. |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Cantwell with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |