US SB3915 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on March 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-01 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-01 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to require the Secretary of Energy to provide technology grants to strengthen domestic mining education, and for other purposes.
Title
Mining Schools Act of 2022 Technology Grants to Strengthen Domestic Mining Education Act of 2022
Sponsors
Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Mark Kelly [D-AZ] |
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] |
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-01 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB8187 (Related) 2022-06-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HB8981 (Related) 2022-10-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HB8981 (Related) 2022-10-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/3915/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s3915/BILLS-117s3915is.pdf |