US SB4128 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 566.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 566.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to require the Comptroller General of the United States to provide certain information with respect to unimplemented priority recommendations as part of the Comptroller General's annual reporting to Congress, and for other purposes.
Title
Improving Government for America's Taxpayers Act
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 566. |
2022-11-28 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 117-213. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB7331 (Same As) 2022-12-05 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 583.