US SB4638 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 433.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 433.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to authorize appropriations for fiscal year 2025 for military activities of the Department of Defense, for military construction, and for defense activities of the Department of Energy, to prescribe military personnel strengths for such fiscal year, and for other purposes.
Title
Military Construction Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2025
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 433. |
2024-07-08 | Senate | Committee on Armed Services. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Reed. With written report No. 118-188. Additional views filed. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3837 (Related) 2024-02-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HB7506 (Related) 2024-02-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
HB8063 (Related) 2024-05-09 - Received in the Senate.
SB2276 (Related) 2023-07-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB2670 (Related) 2023-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 118-31.
HB8070 (Related) 2024-07-08 - Received in the Senate.
SB4486 (Related) 2024-06-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB4635 (Related) 2024-07-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HB7506 (Related) 2024-02-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
HB8063 (Related) 2024-05-09 - Received in the Senate.
SB2276 (Related) 2023-07-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB2670 (Related) 2023-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 118-31.
HB8070 (Related) 2024-07-08 - Received in the Senate.
SB4486 (Related) 2024-06-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB4635 (Related) 2024-07-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-bill/4638/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/s4638/BILLS-118s4638rs.pdf |