US SB484 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to establish grant programs for maternal mental health equity and to grow and diversify the maternal mental and behavioral health care workforce.
Title
Moms Matter Act
Sponsors
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] |
Sen. Jon Ossoff [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB909 (Related) 2021-02-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB959 (Related) 2021-04-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB346 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4486 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8862 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB959 (Related) 2021-04-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB346 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4486 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8862 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/484/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s484/BILLS-117s484is.pdf |