US SB4978 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on January 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 117-356.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on January 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 117-356.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize the State offices of rural health program.
Title
State Offices of Rural Health Program Reauthorization Act of 2022
Sponsors
Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-05 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-356. |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-12-28 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-12-22 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-12-22 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10025) |
2022-12-22 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 4978. |
2022-12-22 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10024-10025) |
2022-12-22 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-12-21 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-12-21 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-12-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7305) |
2022-12-19 | Senate | S.Amdt.6551 Amendment SA 6551 proposed by Senator Kelly for Senator Barrasso. (consideration: CR S7305; text: CR S7305) In the nature of a substitute. |
2022-12-19 | Senate | S.Amdt.6551 Amendment SA 6551 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7305) |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB9137 (Same As) 2022-10-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.