US SB54 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of the Interior, after receiving a request from La Paz County, Arizona, to convey to the county 5,935 acres of specified federal land. Interior shall exclude from such conveyance any federal land that contains significant cultural, environmental, wildlife, or recreational resources. The federal land is withdrawn from the operation of U.S. mining and mineral leasing laws.
Title
La Paz County Land Conveyance Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9. (TXT | PDF)
HB304 (Similar To) 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
SB4475 (Related) 2020-09-16 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
HB7966 (Related) 2020-09-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
HB304 (Similar To) 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
SB4475 (Related) 2020-09-16 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
HB7966 (Related) 2020-09-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Subjects
Arizona
Government liability
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Historical and cultural resources
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Pollution liability
Public lands and natural resources
Government liability
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Historical and cultural resources
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Pollution liability
Public lands and natural resources
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/54/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s54/BILLS-116s54is.pdf |