US SB549 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses access to voting, including by requiring states to allow online voter registration, establish automatic voter registration, permit same day voter registration, and accept voter registration applications from individuals under age 18; prohibiting interference with voter registration or voting; requiring paper ballots and manual counting for recounts and audits; requiring states to allow early voting and voting by mail without additional conditions; making grants to states for poll worker recruitment and training; prohibiting certain political activities by a state's chief state election administration official; making grants for conducting risk-limiting audits of the results of elections; and permanently reauthorizing the Election Assistance Commission.
Title
Voter Empowerment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HB1275 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB1451 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB93 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB650 (Related) 2019-01-17 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB734 (Related) 2019-01-23 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1438 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1460 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB1504 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1513 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1535 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1546 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1573 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SB624 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1834 (Related) 2019-06-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB3281 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
HB1631 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB8941 (Related) 2020-12-10 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1275 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB1451 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB93 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB650 (Related) 2019-01-17 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB734 (Related) 2019-01-23 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1438 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1460 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB1504 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1513 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1535 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1546 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1573 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SB624 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1834 (Related) 2019-06-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB3281 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
HB1631 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB8941 (Related) 2020-12-10 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Administrative remedies
American Samoa
Caribbean area
Citizenship and naturalization
Civil actions and liability
Commemorative events and holidays
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional elections
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime prevention
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of Commerce
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Disability and paralysis
Election Assistance Commission
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Employee leave
Executive agency funding and structure
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Guam
Higher education
Immigration status and procedures
Internet and video services
Law enforcement administration and funding
Licensing and registrations
Military personnel and dependents
Northern Mariana Islands
Political advertising
Postal service
Public contracts and procurement
Puerto Rico
Racial and ethnic relations
State and local government operations
U.S. Postal Service
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands
Voting rights
Administrative remedies
American Samoa
Caribbean area
Citizenship and naturalization
Civil actions and liability
Commemorative events and holidays
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional elections
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime prevention
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of Commerce
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Disability and paralysis
Election Assistance Commission
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Employee leave
Executive agency funding and structure
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Guam
Higher education
Immigration status and procedures
Internet and video services
Law enforcement administration and funding
Licensing and registrations
Military personnel and dependents
Northern Mariana Islands
Political advertising
Postal service
Public contracts and procurement
Puerto Rico
Racial and ethnic relations
State and local government operations
U.S. Postal Service
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands
Voting rights
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/549/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s549/BILLS-116s549is.pdf |