US SB578 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 116-250.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 116-250.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates the five-month waiting period for disability benefits under the Old Age, Survivors, and Disability Insurance program for individuals with amyotrophic lateral sclerosis (a progressive neurodegenerative disease, also known as Lou Gehrig's disease, that affects nerve cells in the brain and spinal cord). Under current law, individuals must wait five months after becoming disabled before their disability insurance benefit payments may begin.
Title
ALS Disability Insurance Access Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-02 - Senate - Passed Senate, under the order of 12/01/20, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, without amendment RC# 250 (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - Senate - Amendment SA 2689, under the order of 12/01/20, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was S.Amdt.2689 RC# 249 (Y: 48 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2020-12-02 - Senate - Amendment SA 2689, under the order of 12/01/20, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was S.Amdt.2689 RC# 249 (Y: 48 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-22 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-250. |
2020-12-22 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-12-11 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-12-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-08 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6988) |
2020-12-08 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 578. |
2020-12-08 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6988-6991) |
2020-12-08 | House | Mr. Larson (CT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2020-12-03 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-12-03 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, under the order of 12/01/20, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 96 - 1. Record Vote Number: 250. (text: CR S7164) |
2020-12-02 | Senate | S.Amdt.2689 Amendment SA 2689, under the order of 12/01/20, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 48 - 49. Record Vote Number: 249. |
2020-12-02 | Senate | S.Amdt.2689 Amendment SA 2689 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Grassley. (consideration: CR S7157, S7163; text: CR S7182-7183) To increase the overpayment collection threshold for old-age, survivors, and disability insurance benefits. |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7157, S7163-7164) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1407 (Related) 2019-02-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.