US SB72 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Small Business Paperwork Mandate Elimination Act of 2011 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to repeal a provision (added by the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act) that extends to corporations that are not tax-exempt the requirement to report payments of $600 or more.
Title
Small Business Paperwork Mandate Elimination Act of 2011
Sponsors
Sen. Max Baucus [D-MT] | Sen. Daniel Akaka [D-HI] | Sen. Mark Begich [D-AK] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Scott Brown [R-MA] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. John Kerry [D-MA] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Mary Landrieu [D-LA] | Sen. Frank Lautenberg [D-NJ] | Sen. Joseph Lieberman [I-CT] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] |
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Benjamin Nelson [D-NE] | Sen. Harry Reid [D-NV] | Sen. John Rockefeller [D-WV] |
Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4 (Same As) 2011-04-14 - Became Public Law No: 112-9.
HB60 (Related) 2011-01-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB144 (Same As) 2011-01-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB18 (Related) 2011-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB584 (Related) 2011-02-09 - Referred to House Appropriations
HB60 (Related) 2011-01-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB144 (Same As) 2011-01-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB18 (Related) 2011-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB584 (Related) 2011-02-09 - Referred to House Appropriations
Subjects
Business records
Corporate finance and management
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Corporate finance and management
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-bill/72/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/s72/BILLS-112s72is.pdf |