US SB732 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-17 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-17 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the PROTECT Act to expand the national AMBER Alert system to territories of the United States, and for other purposes.
Title
AMBER Alert Nationwide Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-17 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-11-17 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-11-17 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6717-6718) |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6717-6718) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4614 (Same As) 2019-10-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Subjects
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against children
Department of Health and Human Services
Emergency communications systems
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Missing persons
Right of privacy
Transportation safety and security
U.S. territories and protectorates
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against children
Department of Health and Human Services
Emergency communications systems
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Missing persons
Right of privacy
Transportation safety and security
U.S. territories and protectorates