US SB738 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permanent Electronic Duck Stamp Act of 2013 - Grants the Secretary of the Interior permanent authority to authorize any state to issue electronic duck stamps. Sets forth state electronic duck stamp application requirements.
Title
Permanent Electronic Duck Stamp Act of 2013
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Max Baucus [D-MT] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Thad Cochran [R-MS] |
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Mark Pryor [D-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1206 (Same As) 2014-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 113-239.
SB1335 (Related) 2013-07-18 - Introduced in the Senate. Read twice. Ordered Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 143.
HB3197 (Related) 2013-10-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
SB1660 (Related) 2013-11-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB3590 (Related) 2014-02-10 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 305.
SB1996 (Related) 2014-02-06 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 304.
SB2363 (Related) 2014-07-10 - Cloture on the bill not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 41 - 56. Record Vote Number: 220. (consideration: CR S4377-4378; text: CR S4377)
SB1335 (Related) 2013-07-18 - Introduced in the Senate. Read twice. Ordered Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 143.
HB3197 (Related) 2013-10-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
SB1660 (Related) 2013-11-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB3590 (Related) 2014-02-10 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 305.
SB1996 (Related) 2014-02-06 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 304.
SB2363 (Related) 2014-07-10 - Cloture on the bill not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 41 - 56. Record Vote Number: 220. (consideration: CR S4377-4378; text: CR S4377)
Subjects
Animals
Art, artists, authorship
Birds
Hunting and fishing
Licensing and registrations
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Art, artists, authorship
Birds
Hunting and fishing
Licensing and registrations
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/738/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s738/BILLS-113s738is.pdf |