US SB741 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 417.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 417.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
North American Wetlands Conservation Extension Act of 2014 - Reauthorizes the North American Wetlands Conservation Act through FY2019.
Title
North American Wetlands Conservation Extension Act of 2014
Sponsors
Sen. David Vitter [R-LA] | Sen. Max Baucus [D-MT] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Thad Cochran [R-MS] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Tim Johnson [D-SD] |
Sen. Mary Landrieu [D-LA] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 417. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Boxer with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 113-187. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2208 (Same As) 2014-06-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 374.
Subjects
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Wetlands
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Water resources funding
Wetlands
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection