US SB973 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tennessee Wilderness Act This bill designates specified federal lands in Cherokee National Forest in Tennessee as wilderness and as additions to the National Wilderness Preservation System.
Title
Tennessee Wilderness Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Bob Corker [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2218 (Related) 2017-05-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
SB1460 (Related) 2017-09-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
SB2099 (Related) 2017-11-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 262.
HB2 (Related) 2018-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-334.
SB1460 (Related) 2017-09-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
SB2099 (Related) 2017-11-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 262.
HB2 (Related) 2018-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-334.
Subjects
Forests, forestry, trees
Public lands and natural resources
Tennessee
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Public lands and natural resources
Tennessee
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/973/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s973/BILLS-115s973is.pdf |