US SJR1 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional Amendment - Limits Members of the House of Representatives to six terms and Members of the Senate to two terms.
Title
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States relative to limiting the number of terms that a Member of Congress may serve.
Sponsors
Sen. David Vitter [R-LA] | Sen. Jim DeMint [R-SC] | Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR53 (Related) 2011-06-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
SJR11 (Related) 2011-04-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HJR71 (Related) 2011-08-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
HJR93 (Related) 2012-01-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
HJR96 (Related) 2012-01-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
SJR11 (Related) 2011-04-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HJR71 (Related) 2011-08-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
HJR93 (Related) 2012-01-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
HJR96 (Related) 2012-01-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-joint-resolution/1/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/sjres1/BILLS-112sjres1is.pdf |