US SJR48 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A joint resolution to approve the 2023 Agreement to Amend the U.S.-FSM Compact, and related agreements, between the Government of the United States of America and the Government of the Federated States of Micronesia, and the 2023 Agreement to Amend the U.S.-RMI Compact, and certain related agreements between the Government of the United States of America and the Government of the Republic of the Marshall Islands, and the 2023 U.S.-Palau Compact Review Agreement between the Government of the United States of America and the Government of the Republic of Palau, to appropriate funds to carry out the agreements, and for other purposes.
Title
Compact of Free Association Amendments Act of 2023
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] |
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1571 (Related) 2023-04-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Foreign Agriculture, and Horticulture.
SB792 (Related) 2023-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HJR96 (Same As) 2023-11-08 - Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
HR1061 (Related) 2024-03-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB4366 (Related) 2024-03-09 - Became Public Law No: 118-42.
HB7476 (Related) 2024-02-29 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Ways and Means, Rules, the Judiciary, Oversight and Accountability, Energy and Commerce, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Agriculture, Science, Space, and Technology, Natural Resources, Education and the Workforce, Armed Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB792 (Related) 2023-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HJR96 (Same As) 2023-11-08 - Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
HR1061 (Related) 2024-03-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB4366 (Related) 2024-03-09 - Became Public Law No: 118-42.
HB7476 (Related) 2024-02-29 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Ways and Means, Rules, the Judiciary, Oversight and Accountability, Energy and Commerce, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Agriculture, Science, Space, and Technology, Natural Resources, Education and the Workforce, Armed Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-joint-resolution/48/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/sjres48/BILLS-118sjres48is.pdf |