US SR130 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR 3/26/2015 S2055-2056)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR 3/26/2015 S2055-2056)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating March 29, 2015, as "Vietnam Veterans Day". Designates March 29, 2015, as Vietnam Veterans Day. Recognizes the contributions of veterans who served in Vietnam during war and peace.
Title
A resolution designating March 29, 2015, as "Vietnam Veterans Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR 3/26/2015 S2055-2056) |
Same As/Similar To
HR168 (Related) 2015-03-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
HR401 (Related) 2015-07-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HR401 (Related) 2015-07-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Asia
Commemorative events and holidays
Conflicts and wars
Congressional tributes
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Vietnam
Asia
Commemorative events and holidays
Conflicts and wars
Congressional tributes
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Vietnam
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-resolution/130/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/sres130/BILLS-114sres130is.pdf |