US SR166 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-26 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5304-5305)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-26 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5304-5305)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Congratulates the former member states of the Organization of African Unity on the 50th year anniversary of its founding, in particular its original 32 member states. Commends African Union (AU) member states for their efforts to promote democratic societies, sustainable economic practices, and peace on the continent. Urges the President to support efforts to strengthen U.S.-AU cooperation, and encourages the President to expand U.S. efforts to achieve the goals of his United States Strategy Toward Sub-Saharan Africa.
Title
A resolution commemorating the 50th anniversary of the founding of the Organization of African Unity (OAU) and commending its successor, the African Union.
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-26 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5304-5305) |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 96. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4062) |
Same As/Similar To
HR234 (Related) 2013-06-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations.
Subjects
Africa
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Rule of law and government transparency
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Rule of law and government transparency
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status