US SR279 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-16 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7309-7310)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-16 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7309-7310)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution reaffirming the commitment of the United States to promote democracy, human rights, and the rule of law in Cambodia. Reaffirms the U.S. commitment to promote democracy, human rights, and the rule of law in Cambodia. Condemns political violence in Cambodia and urges the cessation of human rights violations. Urges: Prime Minister Hun Sen and the Cambodian People's Party to end all harassment and intimidation of Cambodia's opposition and foster an environment where democracy can thrive and flourish; the Department of the Treasury to consider placing all senior Cambodian government officials implicated in such abuses on the Specially Designated Nationals list; and the Cambodian government to free Mr. Kem Sokha and to respect freedom of the press and the rights of its citizens to freely assemble, protest, and speak out against the government. Supports electoral reform efforts in Cambodia and free and fair elections in 2018.
Title
A resolution reaffirming the commitment of the United States to promote democracy, human rights, and the rule of law in Cambodia.
Sponsors
Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-16 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7309-7310) |
2017-11-16 | Senate | S.Amdt.1586 Amendment SA 1586 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-11-16 | Senate | S.Amdt.1586 Amendment SA 1586 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator McCain. (consideration: CR S7309; text: CR S7309) To acknowledge the contributions of nongovernmental organizations in Cambodia. |
2017-11-16 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7308-7310; text of measure as reported: CR S7308-7309) |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 257. |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2017-10-26 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-10-03 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6290-6291) |
Same As/Similar To
HR661 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Asia
Cambodia
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Foreign property
Human rights
International affairs
News media and reporting
Political parties and affiliation
Protest and dissent
Rule of law and government transparency
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Cambodia
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Foreign property
Human rights
International affairs
News media and reporting
Political parties and affiliation
Protest and dissent
Rule of law and government transparency
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status